NJ S327 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides immunity to institutions of higher education for food donations.
Title
Provides immunity to institutions of higher education for food donations.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2012, c.68. |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A1380 |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1380 (Same As) 2012-10-18 - Substituted by S327