NJ S341 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2772
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.
Title
Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2772 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2264 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2264 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S341 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/341_I1.HTM |