NJ S3457 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1709
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $450,000 for Hooked on Fishing-Not on Drugs Program.
Title
Appropriates $450,000 for Hooked on Fishing-Not on Drugs Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3457 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A5113 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A5113 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee