NJ S3476 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2379
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5094 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5094 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns licensing of security officer companies.
Title
Concerns licensing of security officer companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A5094 (1R) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3476 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5094 (1R)
A5094 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.320.
A5094 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.320.