NJ S3587 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3267
Note: Carry Foward to future S2455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A3801
Note: Carry Foward to future S2455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A3801
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $10.5 million supplemental appropriation for increased Per Capita Library Aid.
Title
Makes $10.5 million supplemental appropriation for increased Per Capita Library Aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3587 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3587 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5462 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3801 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3587 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5462 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3801 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3587 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3587_I1.HTM |