NJ S3604 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns prescribing of certain controlled dangerous substances; requires practitioners to check prescription monitoring information before issuing certain prescriptions to emergency department patients; authorizes medical scribes and athletic trainers to access prescription monitoring information.*
Title
Concerns prescribing of certain controlled dangerous substances; requires practitioners to check prescription monitoring information before issuing certain prescriptions to emergency department patients; authorizes medical scribes and athletic trainers to access prescription monitoring information.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5242 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5242 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5242/5300 (ACS) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5300 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Combined with A5242 (ACS)
A5242 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3604 (2R)
A5242 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3604 (2R)