NJ S3628 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3176
Note: Carry Foward to future S2093
Note: Carry Foward to future S2093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Combined with S3150 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Combined with S3150 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education and public and nonpublic high schools and middle schools to adopt anti-hazing policies; expands activities encompassing criminal hazing and upgrades penalties for engaging in these activities.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education and public and nonpublic high schools and middle schools to adopt anti-hazing policies; expands activities encompassing criminal hazing and upgrades penalties for engaging in these activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Combined with S3150 (SCS) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3628 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Combined with S3150 (SCS)
S3628 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Combined with S3150 (SCS)
A5273 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3628 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Combined with S3150 (SCS)
A5273 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee