NJ S3830 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5689 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5689 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $25 million in federal funds available to Department of State for travel and tourism advertising and promotion recovery from COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Makes $25 million in federal funds available to Department of State for travel and tourism advertising and promotion recovery from COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Vincent Polistina [R] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5689 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5689 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.364.