NJ S4276 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.449.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.449.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $32,153,936 to State Agriculture Development Committee, and amends 2017 appropriations for stewardship activities, for farmland preservation purposes.*
Title
Appropriates $32,153,936 to State Agriculture Development Committee, and amends 2017 appropriations for stewardship activities, for farmland preservation purposes.*
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6109 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.449. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A6109 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6109 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4276 (1R)