NJ S4285 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3208
Note: Carry Foward to future A1676
Note: Carry Foward to future A1676
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides accidental death benefits in certain circumstances to surviving spouse and surviving child of SPRS member or retiree who participated in 9/11 World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.
Title
Provides accidental death benefits in certain circumstances to surviving spouse and surviving child of SPRS member or retiree who participated in 9/11 World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4285 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S4285 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A6078 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S4285 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A6078 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee