NJ S516 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1640
Note: Carry Foward to future S54
Note: Carry Over of previous S1898
Note: Carry Over of previous A3036
Note: Carry Foward to future S54
Note: Carry Over of previous S1898
Note: Carry Over of previous A3036
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires plaintiff to obtain affidavit of merit in malpractice suit against enrolled agent.
Title
Requires plaintiff to obtain affidavit of merit in malpractice suit against enrolled agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S516 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S516 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1898 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3036 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3239 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S516 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1898 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3036 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3239 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S516 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/516_I1.HTM |