NJ S59 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1341
Note: Carry Over of previous S2804
Note: Carry Over of previous S2804
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds two public members to NJT board and provides that all NJT board members are voting members. *
Title
Adds two public members to NJT board and provides that all NJT board members are voting members. *
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S59 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
S2804 (Carry Over) 2015-07-23 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
A1919 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
S2804 (Carry Over) 2015-07-23 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
A1919 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)