NJ S619 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4171
Note: Carry Over of previous A5986
Note: Carry Over of previous A5986
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits use of telemedicine and telehealth to authorize patients for medical cannabis and to issue written instructions for dispensing medical cannabis.
Title
Permits use of telemedicine and telehealth to authorize patients for medical cannabis and to issue written instructions for dispensing medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1635 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1635 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.118. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-8-2) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (37-3) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-1) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-6-3) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A1635 (1R) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4171 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1635 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S619 (2R)
A5986 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A1635 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S619 (2R)
A5986 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee