NJ S685 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1756
Note: Carry Foward to future S2078
Note: Carry Over of previous S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Note: Carry Foward to future S2078
Note: Carry Over of previous S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S685 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
S685 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3386 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2922 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S685 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3386 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2922 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee