NJ S758 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S587

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires incarcerated individual from State to be counted at residential address for legislative redistricting purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires incarcerated individual from State to be counted at residential address for legislative redistricting purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (24-10)
2018-09-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S587 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A1987 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback