NJ S812 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns dispensation by an optometrist or ophthalmologist to a patient of drugs delivered to the eye through a contact lens.
Title
Concerns dispensation by an optometrist or ophthalmologist to a patient of drugs delivered to the eye through a contact lens.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Baroni [R] | Rep. Peter Biondi [R] | Sen. Philip Haines [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Approved P.L.2010, c.12. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Substituted for A1756 | |
2010-03-11 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1756 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - Substituted by S812