NJ S829 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3990
Note: Carry Over of previous A5654
Note: Carry Over of previous A5654
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.264.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.264.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires property condition disclosure statement to indicate presence of lead plumbing in residential property.
Title
Requires property condition disclosure statement to indicate presence of lead plumbing in residential property.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2135 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2135 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.264. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A2135 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3990 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2135 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S829 (1R)
A5654 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2135 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S829 (1R)
A5654 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee