NJ S895 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2105 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2105 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that impersonation committed by any means, including electronic communications or Internet website, shall be subject to criminal penalties.**
Title
Clarifies that impersonation committed by any means, including electronic communications or Internet website, shall be subject to criminal penalties.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2105 (3R) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Vitale) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2105 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.241.