NJ S941 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3010

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A1991 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires students at institutions of higher education to receive immunization for meningitis in accordance with recommendations of Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires students at institutions of higher education to receive immunization for meningitis in accordance with recommendations of Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted by A1991 (1R)
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3010 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1991 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback