NJ SCR110 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Honors members of 177th Fighter Wing of New Jersey Air National Guard.
Title
Honors members of 177th Fighter Wing of New Jersey Air National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR145 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading