NJ SCR132 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor to support expansion of Medicaid program.
Title
Urges Governor to support expansion of Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr170 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr170 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-30-0) |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR170 |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-13) |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR170 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Substituted by SCR132
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/SCR132 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/SCR/132_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR132 |