NJ SCR134 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses Legislature's objection to certain recommendations included in the Governor's Educational Adequacy Report.
Title
Expresses Legislature's objection to certain recommendations included in the Governor's Educational Adequacy Report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr172 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Acr172 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-30-0) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR172 |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR172 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Substituted by SCR134
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/SCR134 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/SCR/134_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR134 |