NJ SCR78 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates women's access to reproductive health care and annual anniversary of Supreme Court ruling in Roe v. Wade. *
Title
Commemorates women's access to reproductive health care and annual anniversary of Supreme Court ruling in Roe v. Wade. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr119 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr119 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (23-0) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-21-4) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR119 (2R) |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson) |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-6) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR119 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by SCR78 (2R)