NJ SJR122 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by AJR158 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by AJR158 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Task Force on Medicaid Financial Resource Limits.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Task Force on Medicaid Financial Resource Limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by AJR158 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR158 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR122 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/122_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR122 |