NJ SJR40 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR58

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates last full week of September of each year as "New Jersey Wine Week."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates last full week of September of each year as "New Jersey Wine Week."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2019-05-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR58 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback