NJ SJR59 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by AJR27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by AJR27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Asthma Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Asthma Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted by AJR27 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR27 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-10.
AJR108 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR108 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR59 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/59_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR59 |