NJ SJR77 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county commissioners of registration and boards of election to conduct "Electronic Poll Book Demonstration Project" in certain districts during 2016 elections; requires Division of Elections review and approval of proposed projects.**
Title
Permits county commissioners of registration and boards of election to conduct "Electronic Poll Book Demonstration Project" in certain districts during 2016 elections; requires Division of Elections review and approval of proposed projects.**
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr104 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr104 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR104 (1R) |
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR104 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by SJR77 (2R)