NJ SJR80 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges federal government to adhere to commitment to improve Northeast Corridor rail infrastructure by providing funding to complete Gateway Program.
Title
Urges federal government to adhere to commitment to improve Northeast Corridor rail infrastructure by providing funding to complete Gateway Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR121 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-28. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR121 |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR121 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR80
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR80 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/80_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR80 |