NJ SR40 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR86

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges federal Internal Revenue Service to devote additional resources to combat recent surge in tax-related scams that seek to defraud unsuspecting taxpayers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges federal Internal Revenue Service to devote additional resources to combat recent surge in tax-related scams that seek to defraud unsuspecting taxpayers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2019-03-25SenateResolution Passed Senate (Voice)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

SR86 (Carry Over) 2016-10-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback