NJ SR64 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR84
Note: Carry Over of previous AR238
Note: Carry Over of previous SR124
Note: Carry Over of previous AR238
Note: Carry Over of previous SR124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports Abraham Accords and recognizes importance of peace and coexistence in Middle East.
Title
Supports Abraham Accords and recognizes importance of peace and coexistence in Middle East.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR64 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AR238 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SR124 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AR102 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
AR238 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SR124 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AR102 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SR64 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SR/64_I1.HTM |