NM HB129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm Sale Waiting Period Crimes
Title
Firearm Sale Waiting Period Crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cervantes [D] | Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Rep. Cristina Parajon [D] |
Rep. Andrea Romero [D] | Rep. Patricia Roybal Caballero [D] | Rep. Linda Serrato [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 4 |
2024-02-12 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2024-02-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:23 N:18 |
2024-02-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2024-02-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2024-02-02 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:33 |
2024-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2024-01-30 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-26 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-18 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2024-01-16 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |