NM HB15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 84 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 84 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable Building Tax Credit
Title
Sustainable Building Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Hickey [D] | Rep. Tara Lujan [D] | Rep. Javier Martinez [D] | Rep. Kristina Ortez [D] |
Rep. Linda Serrato [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 84 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-19 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:6 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-13 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:22 |
2021-03-01 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-09 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HTRC |