NM HB151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 34 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 34 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Post-secondary Affirmative Consent Policies
Title
Post-secondary Affirmative Consent Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 34 - Mar. 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:24 N:13 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SJC |
2024-02-04 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:17 |
2024-01-30 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-23 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2024-01-23 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to |
2024-01-18 | House | Not Printed |