NM HB216 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - [LD 37] DNP-CS/DP-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - [LD 37] DNP-CS/DP-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Non-disclosure accident report form info
Title
Non-disclosure accident report form info
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DNP-CS/DP-HJC API. | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] ref HTPWC/HJC-HTPWC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP/a-HTPWC | |
2011-01-23 | [LD 6] HHGAC/HTPWC-HHGAC |