NM HB216 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lesc Public Education Study
Title
Lesc Public Education Study
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2023-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2023-02-13 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-27 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |