NM HB312 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] w/o rec/a-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] w/o rec/a-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homestead exemption increase
Title
Homestead exemption increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] w/o rec/a-SJC API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SCORC/SJC-SCORC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (54-15) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=312&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0312.pdf |