NM HB42 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural electric co-op member voting
Title
Rural electric co-op member voting
Sponsors
Rep. Don Tripp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 38. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP-SCORC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] SRC/SCORC-SRC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP/a | |
2011-02-05 | [LD 19] w/drn h/calendar- ref HJC-HJC | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] DP | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] DP-HVEC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HVEC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |