NM HB43 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State ethics commission act
Title
State ethics commission act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] SRC API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DNP-CS/DP-HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (49-15) | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HCPAC/HJC/HAFC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |