NM HB433 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 239 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Home Inspector Licensing Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Inspector Licensing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 239 - Apr. 4
2019-03-14HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2019-03-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-03-12SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-03-12SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-06SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
2019-03-05HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:55 N:3
2019-03-04HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-02-11HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-31HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC/HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback