NM HB46 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Mar.4) Ch.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Mar.4) Ch.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nmfa public project fund projects
Title
Nmfa public project fund projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-19 | [LD 26] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Mar.4) Ch.31. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (37-0) | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Floor amendment adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Passed House (61-0) | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Printed | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |