NM HB69 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit school retentions through intervention
Title
Limit school retentions through intervention
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Passed House (47-23) | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Floor amendment adopted | |
2012-02-16 | [LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Education | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Printed | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=69&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0069.pdf |