NM HB98 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Accounts For Disabled Eligibility
Title
Accounts For Disabled Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Feb. 29 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2024-02-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2024-02-02 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-29 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-17 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HAFC |
2024-01-16 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |