NM HM15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment compensation task force
Title
Unemployment compensation task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed House (59-6) | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Appropriations & Finance |