NM SB113 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] s/fld cncr API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] s/fld cncr API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Go bond projects
Title
Go bond projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] s/fld cncr API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HTRC/HAFC-HTRC- DP/a-HAFC- DP/a - PASSED/H (54-14) | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] fl/sub adptd- PASSED/S (40-0) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] germane-SFC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SCC/SFC-SCC |