NM SB128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 44 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 44 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Assisted Outpatient Treatment Act Changes
Title
Assisted Outpatient Treatment Act Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 44 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-15 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SJC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |