NM SB129 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continue military & vets' affairs committee
Title
Continue military & vets' affairs committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HAFC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Mar.3) Ch.23. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP - PASSED/S (39-0) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-SPAC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] germane-SRC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SCC/SRC/SPAC-SCC |