NM SB14 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Authority
Title
Health Care Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 39 - Mar. 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:21 |
2024-02-12 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-06 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HAFC |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:15 |
2024-02-03 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-29 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-25 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SRC/SHPAC |