NM SB145 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] fl/a- PASSED/H (61-6) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] fl/a- PASSED/H (61-6) API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Ownership of pore space
Title
Ownership of pore space
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] fl/a- PASSED/H (61-6) API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP/a | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP-HJC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] fl/a- PASSED/S (23-17) | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SCC/SCONC/SJC-SCC-germane-SCONC |