NM SB199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment of insurance agent commissions
Title
Payment of insurance agent commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] DP API. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] HCPAC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] fl/a- PASSED/S (30-0) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP/a | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCORC/SJC-SCORC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=199&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0199.pdf |