NM SB2 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (41-27) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Passed House (41-27) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal record expungement act
Title
Criminal record expungement act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Passed House (41-27) Vetoed by the Governor and date. | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed Senate (35-4) | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |